Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. v. Great American Insurance Company of New York et al

Plaintiff: Grecian Delight Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Moore, Raymond Pawlak, Great American Insurance Company of New York and GM Consultant - USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06310
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 22 MEMORANDUM by Great American Insurance Company of New York in Opposition to motion to remand #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aggreko Contracts, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #3 Declaration of Christopher Snow)(Snow, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 10/10/2018. Joint motion to stay proceedings pending consideration by the Court of Plaintiff's motion to remand #13 is granted. Briefing schedule as to motion to remand #17 : Defendant's response due by 10/31/2018; Plaintiff's reply due by 11/14/2018. Status hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 9:30 AM for ruling on motion to remand. Motion hearing date of 10/17/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 9, 2018 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. (Vishneski, John)
October 9, 2018 19 NOTICE of Motion by John Stanley Vishneski for presentment of motion to remand #17 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/17/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Vishneski, John)
October 9, 2018 18 MEMORANDUM by Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. in support of motion to remand #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vishneski, John)
October 9, 2018 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. to remand (Vishneski, John)
October 8, 2018 16 Corporate Disclosure and Affiliate Notification by Great American Insurance Company of New York (Snow, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 15 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. (Vishneski, John)
October 3, 2018 14 NOTICE of Motion by John Stanley Vishneski for presentment of motion to stay #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/10/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Vishneski, John)
October 3, 2018 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. to stay Proceedings Pending Consideration by Court of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Vishneski, John)
September 24, 2018 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. by Adrienne Kitchen (Kitchen, Adrienne)
September 18, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GM Consultant - USA LLC, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Daniel Moore, Raymond Pawlak by Matthew S. Ponzi (Ponzi, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. by Stanley C Nardoni (Nardoni, Stanley)
September 18, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. by Jessica Elizabeth Brown (Brown, Jessica)
September 18, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. by John Stanley Vishneski (Vishneski, John)
September 18, 2018 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 10/10/2018 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/3/2018. Mailed notice (mw, )
September 17, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Christopher Mark Henry Snow on behalf of All Defendants regarding notice of removal, #1 , attorney appearance #3 , civil cover sheet #2 (Snow, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
September 17, 2018 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
September 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (acm)
September 14, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GM Consultant - USA LLC, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Daniel Moore, Raymond Pawlak by Christopher Mark Henry Snow (Snow, Christopher)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Snow, Christopher)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, County Department, Chancery Division, case number (2018CH10352) filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14951226. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Snow, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecian Delight Foods, Inc. v. Great American Insurance Company of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Moore
Represented By: Christopher Mark Henry Snow
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Pawlak
Represented By: Christopher Mark Henry Snow
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Christopher Mark Henry Snow
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Consultant - USA LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mark Henry Snow
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grecian Delight Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John Stanley Vishneski
Represented By: Adrienne Kitchen
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Brown
Represented By: Stanley C Nardoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?