Shorter v. Paloian

Appellee: Gus A Paloian
Appellant: Michael Shorter
Case Number: 1:2018cv06409
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
1 Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The record in this bankruptcy appeal was entered on the docket on 9/20/2018. The case was reassigned to Judge Virginia M. Kendall on 10/9/2018. Appellant initial brief due by 12/21/2018. Appellee response brief due by 1/22/2019. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 19, 2018 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
October 9, 2018 4 NOTICE of Correction #3 (nsf, )
October 9, 2018 3 ENTERED IN ERROR Modified on 10/9/2018 (nsf, ).
October 9, 2018 2 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b) for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/5/2018. (nsf, )
September 21, 2018 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
September 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (lma, )
September 20, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 B 09257 (Judge Hollis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shorter v. Paloian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gus A Paloian
Represented By: Christopher James Harney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Shorter
Represented By: Adil S. Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?