Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182
Case Number: 1:2018cv06429
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case was called for a status hearing on 11/13/2018. Parties did not appear or contact the court. Status hearing is continued to 12/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. If no one appears at the next status, the case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 10/4/2018. Status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/4/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mma, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2018. (mma, )
September 21, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (lma, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14975265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 107.131.148.182
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?