Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.201.221.78
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.201.221.78
Case Number: 1:2018cv06430
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the status report #11 filed on 11/1/2018, the status hearing set for 11/6/2018 is stricken and reset to 1/29/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. Counsel to submit a proposed order. Notice of motion date of 10/3/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/3/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 11/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright numbers)(aee, )
September 21, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (lma, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14975340. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.201.221.78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.201.221.78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?