Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc.
Defendant: Edwina Jenkins and United State of America c/o HUD
Case Number: 1:2018cv06544
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/31/2018.(lf, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Parties have advised the Court that the motion before Judge Leinenweber to reassign this case to his calendar was granted. Accordingly, the status hearing set for 11/6/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion of the United States for an extension of time until 10/26/2018 to answer and otherwise plead #4 is granted. Initial status hearing is set for 11/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Notice of motion date of 10/3/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Joseph Kelly for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/3/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Kelly, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant United State of America c/o HUD for extension of time to file answer (Kelly, Michael)
September 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (daj, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Michael Joseph Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United State of America c/o HUD (Kelly, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (16 CH 1665) filed by United State of America c/o HUD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing)(Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc. v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwina Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America c/o HUD
Represented By: Michael Joseph Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?