PNC Bank v. Muhammad
Plaintiff: PNC Bank
Defendant: Ronald Muhammad
Case Number: 1:2018cv06549
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Muhammad for presentment of motion to strike #17 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (ek, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Ronald Muhammad answer to defendant's motion to remand, which is a motion to dismiss in violation of the injunction act, in the nature of a motion to strike. (ek, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 11/1/2018. Parties failed to appear. Ruling on PNC's motion for remand and for attorney's fees #11 and Defendant's motion for reconsideration #15 are reset for 11/28/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Ronald Muhammad for reconsideration. (tt, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Motion hearing held on 10/17/2018. By 11/1/18, defendant Ronald Muhammad shall file a response to PNC's motion for remand and for attorney's fees #11 . Ruling set for 11/5/18 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Brian R Merfeld for presentment of motion to remand #11 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/17/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Merfeld, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by PNC Bank re attorney appearance #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff PNC Bank to remand and for Award of Attorney's Fees #11 (Merfeld, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff PNC Bank to remand and for Award of Attorney's Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Merfeld, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
October 11, 2018 MAILED Minute entry, Dkt. 9, entered on 10/11/2018 to: PNC, c/o McCall, Raymer, Pierce LLC, 1 N. Dearborn St., Ste. 1200, Chicago, IL 60602 (reg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (reg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank as to Ronald Muhammad on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (yap, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank as to Ronald Muhammad on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (yap, )
September 27, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff PNC Bank (yt)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of removal letter to all counsel of record. (mma, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Ronald Muhammad (mma, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mma, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (12 CH 26341) filed by Ronald Muhammad Filing fee $ 400. (mma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank v. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?