Riviana Foods, Inc. v. Jacobson Warehouse Inc.
Plaintiff: Riviana Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Jacobson Warehouse Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06550
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 MAILED Rule 83.15 letter to all counsel of record. (mma, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 RECEIVED from New York Southern; Case Number 7:18-cv-06692 (mma)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by Riviana Foods, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk is to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois forthwith. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/24/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Lawrence C. Glynn dated September 24, 2018 re: Request for Transfer to Northern District of Illinois Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Document filed by Riviana Foods, Inc..(Glynn, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause by September 24, 2018, why this Court should not dismiss this action or transfer it to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). See Minnette v. Time Warner, 997 F.2d 1023, 1026 (2d Cir. 1993). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/14/2018) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacobson Warehouse Inc.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: XPO Logistics-Supply Chain. The party was added to the case in error. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Riviana Foods, Inc., Jacobson Warehouse Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent New World Pasta Company, Corporate Parent Ebro Foods, S.A., Other Affiliate Skinner, Other Affiliate Comet Products, Inc., Other Affiliate American Rice, Inc., Other Affiliate Minute, Other Affiliate Mahatma, Other Affiliate Success Rice, Other Affiliate Adolphus, Other Affiliate Blue Ribbon, Other Affiliate Ronzoni, Other Affiliate Prince Pasta, Other Affiliate American Beauty, Other Affiliate Creamette, Other Affiliate No Yolks, Other Affiliate River Food, Other Affiliate Water Maid, Other Affiliate Rice Select, Other Affiliate Catelli, Other Affiliate WackyMac, Other Affiliate Light & Fluffy, Other Affiliate Gourmet House, Inc. for Riviana Foods, Inc.. Document filed by Riviana Foods, Inc..(Glynn, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacobson Warehouse Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riviana Foods, Inc.. (Glynn, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glynn, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacobson Warehouse Inc., XPO Logistics-Supply Chain. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15367222)Document filed by Riviana Foods, Inc..(Glynn, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riviana Foods, Inc. v. Jacobson Warehouse Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobson Warehouse Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riviana Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Caruso Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?