Jones v. Chicago Housing Authority et al

Plaintiff: Treva Jones
Defendant: Chicago Housing Authority and Eugene Jones
Case Number: 1:2018cv06599
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
0 Judge: John Z Lee
1 Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Brian Hoppe for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/29/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Hoppe, Brian)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants Chicago Housing Authority, Eugene Jones for extension of time (Hoppe, Brian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY by Treva Jones to memorandum in support of motion #10 , response in opposition to motion #21 , MOTION by Plaintiff Treva Jones for preliminary injunction #9 (Koriath, Jaclyn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing previously set for 11/14/18 is stricken. (ca, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by All Defendants re response in opposition to motion #21 (Hoppe, Brian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Chicago Housing Authority, Eugene Jonesin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Treva Jones for preliminary injunction #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoppe, Brian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 STATUS Report by Treva Jones (Hallbauer, Miriam)
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treva Jones as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hallbauer, Miriam)
October 30, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Eugene Jones (lma, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under MIDPP (Hallbauer, Miriam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE mandatory discovery (Koriath, Jaclyn)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE mandatory discovery (Margalit, Ainat)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 10/11/18. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #9 shall be due by 11/8/18; reply due by 11/15/18. Status hearing set for 11/29/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago Housing Authority, Eugene Jones by Sunil Kumar (Kumar, Sunil)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago Housing Authority, Eugene Jones by Cynthia Barnes Harris (Harris, Cynthia)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago Housing Authority, Eugene Jones by Brian Hoppe (Hoppe, Brian)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jaclyn Zarack Koriath for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #9 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Koriath, Jaclyn)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Treva Jones in support of motion for preliminary injunction #9 (Koriath, Jaclyn)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Treva Jones for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Koriath, Jaclyn)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 11/14/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Treva Jones by Miriam V. Hallbauer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hallbauer, Miriam)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee pursuant to 28:294(b). Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/28/2018. (nsf, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Treva Jones by Ainat Natalie Margalit (Margalit, Ainat)
September 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (daj, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Koriath, Jaclyn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Treva Jones by Jaclyn Zarack Koriath (Koriath, Jaclyn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Treva Jones; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15001340. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Koriath, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Chicago Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treva Jones
Represented By: Jaclyn Zarack Koriath
Represented By: Ainat Natalie Margalit
Represented By: Miriam V. Hallbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Housing Authority
Represented By: Cynthia Barnes Harris
Represented By: Brian Hoppe
Represented By: Sunil Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Jones
Represented By: Cynthia Barnes Harris
Represented By: Brian Hoppe
Represented By: Sunil Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?