Mallett v. Owens et al

Petitioner: Robert Mallett
Respondent: Angela M Owens and A. M. Owens
Case Number: 1:2018cv06636
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by November 30, 2018. Petitioner shall file a reply in support of the habeas corpus petition by December 28, 2018. The Clerk is instructed to send a copy of this order to Mr. Tom Walsh, Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of Illinois. The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect that Respondent is A.M. Owens, Warden, MCC Chicago. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/1/2018. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Robert Mallett of Change of Address (Envelope postmarked 10/25/2018) (sxb, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Robert Mallett against Angela M Owens (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9/24/2018) (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallett v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela M Owens
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. M. Owens
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?