Horlbeck v. Tillman Enterprises, LLC

Appellant: Todd S. Horlbeck
Appellee: Tillman Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06650
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Appellant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted to and including 1/28/2019 to file his Appellate Brief. Initial status hearing set for 12/3/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Todd S. Horlbeck by Jared Matthew Schneider (Schneider, Jared)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Appellant Todd S. Horlbeck for extension of time Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burke, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Cross Appeal (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Adv Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Todd S. Horlbeck by John Sheridan Burke (Burke, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3))(bg, )
October 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (jjr, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 A 26 (Judge Baer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 Adv Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horlbeck v. Tillman Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Todd S. Horlbeck
Represented By: Jared Matthew Schneider
Represented By: John S. Burke
Represented By: John Sheridan Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tillman Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Timothy James Oliver
Represented By: Channing Blair Hesse
Represented By: Amy Galvin Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?