Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. Tec Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Philips Electronics India, LTD, Philips North America LLC and Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Defendant: Transtate Equipment Company and Tec Holdings, Inc
Respondent: Jordan Health Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06659
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Motion hearing held. Counsel reported on the status of Jordan Health's compliance with Plaintiff's subpoena. By agreement, Plaintiff's motion to compel #1 is entered and continued to 12/3/18 at 9:45 a.m. If the parties jointly contact the Courtroom Deputy, Alyssia Owens, at Alyssia_Owens@ilnd.uscourts.gov, prior to the next hearing confirming that the subpoena has been complied with and Plaintiff will withdraw its motion, the hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice (ao,)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Motion hearing held. Subpoena Respondent Jordan Health reported on the status of compliance with Plaintiffs' subpoena. By agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs' motion to compel #1 is entered and continued to 11/19/18 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ao,)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Motion hearing held. Parties prefer to engage in a fulsome meet and confer on Plaintiffs' motion to compel #1 . Plaintiffs' motion is entered and continued to 11/5/18 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Jordan Health confirmed that Jordan Health will not renew its motion to transfer with the District Judge until after this Court has ruled on the pending motion. Mailed notice (ao,)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to Response #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Schaum, Timothy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Respondent Jordan Health Products' motion to transfer case #13 to the issue court is denied. Although it is often sensible to invoke Rule 45(f) to transfer a subpoena-related motion to the issuing court, Jordan Health's motion offers nothing beyond a generic nod to the issuing court's management of the case. No specifics are offered, and the sparse response #12 to the initial motion to compel adds no reason to think that a transfer is appropriate. The motion is denied.Emailed notice (eec)
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy M Schaum for presentment of motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/25/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Schaum, Timothy)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. to appear pro hac vice #14 on behalf of Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC is granted.Emailed notice (slb, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Philips Electronics India, LTD, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC to transfer case Motion to Compel to Issuing Court #13 (Hultquist, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Motion hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to enforce subpoena #1 set for 10/10/18 at 9:15 a.m. is stricken and reset to 10/24/18 at 9:15 a.m. to allow the District Court time to resolve Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC's motion to transfer case #13 . Mailed notice (ao,)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Motion to transfer case #13 and motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 shall be noticed for presentment before District Judge Chang. Motion hearing set for 10/11/18 before Judge Weisman is stricken. Motion hearing set for 10/10/18 at 9:15 a.m. before Judge Weisman remains. Mailed notice (ao,)
October 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy M Schaum for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #14 , motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable M. David Weisman on 10/11/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schaum, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15032986. on behalf of Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. (Schaum, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC to transfer case Motion to Compel to Issuing Court (Schaum, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC to declaration, #3 , memorandum in support of motion #2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schaum, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC by Timothy M Schaum (Schaum, Timothy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Jordan Health Products, LLC by Robert S. Grabemann (Grabemann, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of before Honorable M. David Weisman on 10/10/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Hultquist, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable M. David Weisman. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/5/2018. (mma, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the motion #1 to enforce subpoena, the motion is referred to the magistrate judge. The hearing of 10/09/2018 with Judge Chang is vacated, and may be re-noticed with the magistrate judge after the referral's entry. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/9/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Hultquist, James)
October 2, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (jjr, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Philips Electronics India, LTD, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC by James Terrence Hultquist (Hultquist, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hultquist, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION regarding miscellaneous case, #1 , memorandum in support of motion #2 of James T. Hultquist (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Hultquist, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Comple Compliance by Non-Party Jordan Health Products, LLC a/k/a Avante Health Solutions with a Subpoena Duces Tecum (Hultquist, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Philips Electronics India, LTD, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC Motion to Compel Compliance by Non-Party Jordan Health Products, LLC A/K/A Avante Health Solutions with a Subpoena Duces Tecum Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-15013804. (Hultquist, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. Tec Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Electronics India, LTD
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transtate Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tec Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jordan Health Products, LLC
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S. Grabemann
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?