Bulger v. Will County et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bulger
Defendant: Will County, Officer Martin Stortz, Officer Michael Janovyak, Officer Thomas Hannon, Officer Paul Rojek and Will County Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 1:2018cv06730
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion #7 for extension of time is withdrawn. Defendants' corrected motion #8 for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due 12/6/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Thomas Hannon, Michael Janovyak, Paul Rojek, Will County, Will County Sheriffs Office for extension of time CORRECTED - To Answer or Otherwise Plead (Condon, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Thomas Hannon, Michael Janovyak, Paul Rojek, Martin Stortz, Will County, Will County Sheriffs Office for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Condon, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/20/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Condon, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Thomas Hannon, Michael Janovyak, Paul Rojek, Will County, Will County Sheriffs Office by Kevin Mark Casey (Casey, Kevin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Thomas Hannon, Michael Janovyak, Paul Rojek, Will County, Will County Sheriffs Office by Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr (Condon, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (jn, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Bulger by David Brian Nemeroff (Nemeroff, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nemeroff, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Bulger; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15028122. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nemeroff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulger v. Will County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Martin Stortz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Janovyak
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas Hannon
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Paul Rojek
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Condon, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bulger
Represented By: David Brian Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?