Fund Recovery Services, LLC. v. Crane et al

Appellee: Samantha Rae Wilder, Dennis C. Cantrell, Eugene Crane, Lindsay Fore, Sonja Hallmon, Eric Shorter, Joseph N. Roberson, Mathew V. Muniz, Karen Vinson, Patti M. Couture, Yolanda J. McKinney, John K. Brigoli, Kim L. King, Stephen Craig Brown, Theresa Madrigal, Karensa Hutchens, Tiffany N. Comfort, John Fountaine, Dennis B. Estrada-Jiminez, Donald Dotson, Steven Prescott, Rosemary Gonzalez-Lopez, Dean Sipe, Delilah Jasso Rodriguez and Felicia M. Spiller
Appellant: Fund Recovery Services, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06778
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 APPELLANT'S Brief by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Notice of Filing)(Roberts, Peter)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 03/22/2018, 05/10/2018, 07/17/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15159129. (Wilens, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on September 18, 2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #4 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Gonzalez, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC. by Peter John Roberts (Roberts, Peter)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel on record. (kp, )
October 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (daj, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 B 39654 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fund Recovery Services, LLC. v. Crane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Samantha Rae Wilder
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis C. Cantrell
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eugene Crane
Represented By: Jeffrey Chad Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lindsay Fore
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sonja Hallmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric Shorter
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph N. Roberson
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mathew V. Muniz
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Vinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patti M. Couture
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Yolanda J. McKinney
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John K. Brigoli
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kim L. King
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stephen Craig Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Theresa Madrigal
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karensa Hutchens
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tiffany N. Comfort
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Fountaine
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis B. Estrada-Jiminez
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donald Dotson
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven Prescott
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rosemary Gonzalez-Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dean Sipe
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Delilah Jasso Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Felicia M. Spiller
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilens
Represented By: Derek V Lofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fund Recovery Services, LLC.
Represented By: Peter John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?