Lopez v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06828
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by David Lopez re Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP #36 NOTICE OF FILING (Northcutt, Lance)
December 3, 2018 Filing 36 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Initial Status Report, filed by Plaintiff David Lopez. (Northcutt, Lance)
December 3, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The initial status hearing set for 12/6/18 is stricken for failure to file a joint status report. The status hearing is reset for 12/18/18 at 9:00 a.m.The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing per my standing order. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by David Lopez NOTICE OF SERVICE (Northcutt, Lance)
November 9, 2018 Filing 33 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Kandyba, Mary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Kandyba, Mary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Correction regarding #30 (ek, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by David Lopez re certificate #29 NOTICE OF FILING (Keiser, Timothy) (Linked document has the incorrect case number listed.) Modified on 11/9/2018 (ek, ).
November 8, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Keiser, Timothy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc.. (Rupkey, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc.. (Burke, Thomas)
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Northcutt, Lance)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc. re certificate #24 , answer to complaint #23 (Burke, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Burke, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc.(Burke, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant J.B. Hunt's motion for leave to file its answer to Plaintiff's amended complaint #17 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Devries, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Kandyba, Mary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company(Kandyba, Mary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas P. Burke for presentment of motion to file instanter #17 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Burke, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc. to file instanter Answer & Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's motion for leave to file its answer to Plaintiff's amended complaint #14 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Louise Kandyba for presentment of motion for leave to file #14 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/31/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kandyba, Mary)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Kandyba, Mary)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 12/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc. by Daniel T. Rupkey (Rupkey, Daniel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction regarding #9 (sxb, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Entered in Error (sxb, ) Modified on 10/12/2018 (sxb, ).
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Lopez by Timothy John Keiser (Keiser, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Lopez by Lance D. Northcutt (Northcutt, Lance)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Consent to Removal by J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc. (Burke, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc. by Thomas P. Burke (Burke, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (acm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Edward A Devries (Devries, Edward)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Mary Louise Kandyba (Kandyba, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Law Division, case number (17L010777) filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15047234. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kandyba, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Mary Louise Kandyba
Represented By: Edward A Devries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transports, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Burke
Represented By: Daniel T. Rupkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Represented By: Timothy John Keiser
Represented By: Lance D. Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?