Boyzo v. United Services Companies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Elvia Garcia Boyzo
Defendant: United Temps, Inc., United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc. and Richard Simon
Case Number: 1:2018cv06854
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 17 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Kevin Mulherin for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Mulherin, Joseph)
December 4, 2018 16 MOTION by Defendants Richard Simon, United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc., United Temps, Inc. for extension of time to file responsive pleading ( Unopposed) (Mulherin, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for additional time #13 is granted in part. The due date for the response to complaint is extended to 12/10/2018, not 12/14/2018 as requested, so that the response is on file before the initial status hearing set for 12/11/2018. (mk)
November 9, 2018 14 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Kevin Mulherin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/15/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Mulherin, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 13 MOTION by Defendants Richard Simon, United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc., United Temps, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Mulherin, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Mulherin, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard Simon, United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc., United Temps, Inc. by Joseph Kevin Mulherin (Mulherin, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard Simon, United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc., United Temps, Inc. by Elizabeth N. Hall (Hall, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 12/11/2018 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
November 6, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elvia Garcia Boyzo by Javier Eduardo Castro (Castro, Javier)
October 26, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvia Garcia Boyzo as to United Maintenance Company, Inc. on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Williams, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvia Garcia Boyzo as to United Services Companies, Inc. on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Williams, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvia Garcia Boyzo as to United Temps, Inc. on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Williams, Christopher)
October 23, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants United Maintenance Company, Inc., United Services Companies, Inc., United Temps, Inc. (jjr, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elvia Garcia Boyzo by Christopher J. Williams (Williams, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Williams, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elvia Garcia Boyzo by Lydia Colunga-Merchant (Colunga-Merchant, Lydia)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elvia Garcia Boyzo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15051381. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Williams, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyzo v. United Services Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Temps, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Maintenance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Simon
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Garcia Boyzo
Represented By: Lydia Colunga-Merchant
Represented By: Christopher J. Williams
Represented By: Javier Eduardo Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?