The City of Chicago v. Sessions III

Plaintiff: The City of Chicago
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III
Case Number: 1:2018cv06859
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
1 Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Consent motion to stay and to set a response date to the amended complaint #31 is granted. Amended complaint to be filed by 12/17/18, response by 1/18/19. Status hearing set for 1/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
December 7, 2018 32 NOTICE of Motion by Brad P. Rosenberg for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, motion for extension of time to file answer, #31 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Rosenberg, Brad)
December 7, 2018 31 MOTION by Defendant Jefferson Beauregard Sessions IIIConsent Motion to Stay Response to the Complaint and to Set Deadline to Respond to the Forthcoming Amended Complaint , MOTION by Defendant Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
December 7, 2018 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III by Brad P. Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad)
November 2, 2018 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: In light of the reassignment the Scheduling Conference previously set before Judge Bucklo for 1/10/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 31, 2018 28 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/31/2018. (mma, )
October 19, 2018 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions to appear pro hac vice #24 and #25 are granted. Mailed notice (reg)
October 17, 2018 26 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $150.00, receipt no. 0752-15054110, (Adegbile, Debo)
October 17, 2018 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15073255. (Evans, Ari)
October 17, 2018 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15072977. (Baxenberg, Justin)
October 17, 2018 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 1/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' Rule 26(f) planning report due 1/7/2019. The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 16, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff The City of Chicago regarding Summons in a Civil Action ; Complaint; Exhibits served on Jamia Williams, Mail Clerk & Authorized Agent on October 15, 2018 (Crowl, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Minute entry dated 10/15/2018, docket no. 18 is amended to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's counsel's name, David W. Ogden. Order stand in all other respects.Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 16, 2018 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Tal Cohen Chaiken (Chaiken, Tal)
October 15, 2018 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Andrew W Worseck (Worseck, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Application to appear pro hac vice of Brian David Ogden #7 ; Jamie Gorelick #8 , Debo Adegbile #9 , Ari Holtzblatt #10 ; Ari Savitzky #11 and Molly Jennings #12 as counsel for Plaintiff, The City of Chicago are granted. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, and U.S. Attorney(pj, )
October 12, 2018 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Scott Douglas Spears (Spears, Scott)
October 12, 2018 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Laura A Kleinman (Kleinman, Laura)
October 12, 2018 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Harnaik Singh Kahlon (Kahlon, Harnaik)
October 12, 2018 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Matthew Charles Crowl (Crowl, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Ronald S. Safer (Safer, Ronald)
October 12, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15054641. (Jennings, Molly)
October 12, 2018 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15054481. (Savitzky, Ari)
October 12, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15054436. (Holtzblatt, Ari)
October 12, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15054293. (Adegbile, Debo)
October 12, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15054037. (Gorelick, Jamie)
October 12, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15053933. (Ogden, David)
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Justin Anthony Houppert (Houppert, Justin)
October 12, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The City of Chicago by Edward N Siskel (Siskel, Edward)
October 12, 2018 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Siskel, Edward)
October 12, 2018 3 NOTICE by The City of Chicago of Claims of Unconstitutionality (Siskel, Edward)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Siskel, Edward)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by The City of Chicago; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15052376. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Siskel, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Chicago v. Sessions III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Represented By: Scott Douglas Spears
Represented By: Harnaik Singh Kahlon
Represented By: Laura A Kleinman
Represented By: Justin Anthony Houppert
Represented By: Edward N Siskel
Represented By: Matthew Charles Crowl
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Justin Baxenberg
Represented By: David W. Ogden
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Represented By: Jamie S Gorelick
Represented By: Tal Cohen Chaiken
Represented By: Ari J Savitzky
Represented By: Ari D. Evans
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: Molly Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?