Signature Transportation Group, LLC et al v. Jacobs et al

Plaintiff: Janet Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC and Salvatore Milazzo
Defendant: George Jacobs and Windy City Limousine Manager, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06896
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 12/19/18 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 12, 2018 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Signature Transportation Group, LLC, Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo. George Jacobs waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; Windy City Limousine Manager, LLC waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Johnson, Neil)
October 19, 2018 8 Response to Request Trademark Letter STATEMENT by Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC (Wasserman, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm)
October 15, 2018 6 MAILED Request Trademark Letter to Attorney Matthew Charles Wasserman. (smm)
October 15, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (ec, )
October 12, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC by Neil P Johnson (Johnson, Neil)
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC by Margaret Anne Gisch (Gisch, Margaret)
October 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC by Matthew Charles Wasserman (Wasserman, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 2 Plaintiffs' rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo, Signature Transportation Group, LLC (Wasserman, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Unfair Competition in Violation of Lanham Act and for Other Relief filed by Signature Transportation Group, LLC, Janet Milazzo, Salvatore Milazzo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15056142. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wasserman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signature Transportation Group, LLC et al v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Milazzo
Represented By: Matthew Charles Wasserman
Represented By: Margaret Anne Gisch
Represented By: Neil P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signature Transportation Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Charles Wasserman
Represented By: Margaret Anne Gisch
Represented By: Neil P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Milazzo
Represented By: Matthew Charles Wasserman
Represented By: Margaret Anne Gisch
Represented By: Neil P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windy City Limousine Manager, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?