Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company v. FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings

Petitioner: Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company
Respondent: FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Case Number: 1:2018cv06897
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 11/29/2018. Briefing schedule on motion to remand: Defendant's response is due by 12/20/2018; Plaintiff's reply is due by 1/18/2019. Stay remains in place through 4/10/2019. Next status date set for 1/16/2019 is stricken and reset for 4/10/19 at 9:30 AM for ruling on motion to remand. Mailed notice (rj, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (rj, ).
November 13, 2018 15 MOTION by Petitioner Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company to remand (corrected Motion, replacing the prior motion erroneously filed) (Blumenthal, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2018 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey S. Blumenthal for presentment of motion to remand #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/29/2018 at 01:45 PM. (Blumenthal, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2018 13 MOTION by Petitioner Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company to remand (Blumenthal, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company (Blumenthal, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company by Jeffrey S. Blumenthal (Blumenthal, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion to stay and stays this matter through 1/16/2019 #6 . The Court sets an initial status date for 1/16/2019 at 9:30 AM with the initial status report due by 1/11/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 17, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Eric S. Rein (Rein, Eric)
October 17, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Matthew R. Barrett (Barrett, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 7 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew R. Barrett for presentment of motion to stay #6 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/25/2018 at 01:45 PM. (Barrett, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 6 MOTION by Respondent FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Barrett, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
October 16, 2018 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/16/2018. (yap, )
October 15, 2018 3 MAILED Notice of Removal to letter to counsel of record. (yap, )
October 15, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (ec, )
October 15, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barrett, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2017COTD4734) filed by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15056149. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Barrett, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company v. FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Blumenthal
Represented By: Andrew William Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?