Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund et al v. MORCOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Plaintiff: Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund and Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Pension Fund
Defendant: MORCOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv06938
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: In light of the parties' stated consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge, the Court strikes the status hearing set for 12/13/18 and directs the parties to file their consent on the docket by 12/19/18. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63 re status report, #11 (McGuire, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63 (McGuire, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Morcom Construction Company by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Morcom Construction Company by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Morcom Construction Company by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 12/13/2018 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/6/2018. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Pension Fund as to Morcom Construction Company on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (McGuire, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Fund, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63 by Grant Reece Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Fund, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63 by Michael J. McGuire (McGuire, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGuire, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63, Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund, Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc., Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Fund; no. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15065880. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(McGuire, Michael)
October 16, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (lma, )
October 16, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MORCOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund et al v. MORCOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Fund
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Metal Trainee School for Local No. 63 and The Iron League of Chicago, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural and Ornamental Iron Workers Union Local No. 63
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Iron Workers Local No 63 Defined Contribution Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORCOM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Cahill
Represented By: Todd Abraham Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?