Hitselberger v. Unigroup, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon L Hitselberger
Defendant: Unigroup, Inc. and Alpha Moving and Storage
Intervenor Defendant: Mayflower Transit, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07279
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: On 03/25/19, the Court received a second motion to reconsider from Plaintiff. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider is denied for the same reasons previously stated. #30 Plaintiff is warned that the Court will not consider or acknowledge any future documents sent directly to Chambers. Plaintiff must file all future filings electronically or send them to the Clerk's Office and follow all other civil procedure rules proscribed by law and this Court. Mailed notice (srn, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Sharon L Hitselberger to reconsider (rp, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:On 02/22/19, the Court received a packet from Plaintiff asking the Court to review a large number of statutes and documents. The Court will treat Plaintiff's request as a motion to reconsider the Court's order dismissing Plaintiff's case. However, the packet did not contain any argument or provide any reason to refute the Court's order. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion #28 is denied. If Plaintiff wishes to appeal the Court's decision, she may do so within 30 days of the date of this order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). The Court also reminds Plaintiff that all future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office or filed electronically, not sent directly to chambers. Finally, Plaintiff is advised that she may make an appointment with the pro se help desk on the 20th floor of the Dirksen Federal Courthouse by calling (312) 435-5691. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Sharon L Hitselberger for reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(rp, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed on 2/7/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER:Defendants' motion to dismiss #17 is granted with prejudice. Defendants Alpha Moving & Storage and UniGroup Inc.'s motion to join in Mayflower's motion to dismiss #24 is granted. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/7/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Sharon L Hitselbergerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc. to join in MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc #17) and Reply (Doc #23) #24 (Attachments: #1 Supplement statutes, effective tariff)(Hitselberger, Sharon)
January 24, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc. to join in MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc #17) and Reply (Doc #23) (Orleans, Jason)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY by Defendants Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc., Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1, #2 Supplement 2)(Hitselberger, Sharon)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Sharon L Hitselberger to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC #17 (Attachments: #1 Supplement A)(Hitselberger, Sharon)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Minute entry #19 was entered in error. The minute entry is vacated and the status hearing set for 1/28/2019 before Judge Coleman is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 1/7/2019. Defendant has not filed a responsive pleading because the parties have reached a settlement in principle. Status hearing is set for 1/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 STATEMENT by Sharon L Hitselberger (Received for docketing 1/3/2019) (rp, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Patt, Roenan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Mayflower's motion to intervene #8 is granted. Defendant Mayflower's motion for leave to file its motion to dismiss #9 is granted. Plaintiff's response is due by 1/10/2019. Defendant's reply is due by 1/24/2019. Discovery is stayed pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. Status hearing held on 12/10/2018. Status hearing set for 2/12/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 12/3/2018. Plaintiff did not appear. Status hearing continued to 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Intervenor's motion to continue the motion hearing date #13 is granted. The 11/26/2018 notice motion date is vacated and reset for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC to continue (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Orleans, Jason)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Jason Orleans on behalf of Mayflower Transit, LLC (Orleans, Jason)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Orleans for presentment of motion to intervene #8 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/26/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Orleans, Jason)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Orleans for presentment of motion for leave to file #9 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/26/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Orleans, Jason)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC for leave to file responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Orleans, Jason)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Mayflower Transit, LLC to intervene (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc. Rule 7.1(a) Disclosure Statement of Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Rule 7.1 (a) Disclosure Statement of Defendants)(Orleans, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc. for disclosure Statement of Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Joint status report due by 1/3/2019. Status hearing set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Orleans, Jason)
November 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Lake County, case number (2018SC00005519) filed by Alpha Moving and Storage, Unigroup, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15129314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Orleans, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitselberger v. Unigroup, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigroup, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Moving and Storage
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L Hitselberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mayflower Transit, LLC
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?