United States of America v. Oehler et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John R. Oehler and Sharon C. Oehler
Case Number: 1:2018cv07330
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. Sharon C. Oehler waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Wille, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. John R. Oehler waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Wille, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 1/18/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
November 2, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Robert Joseph Wille, Jr (Wille, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Wille, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Oehler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Oehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon C. Oehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Joseph Wille, Jr.
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?