Amo v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Petitioner: Nana Yaw Amo
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2018cv07381
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ew, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is dismissed without prejudice. Petitioner is advised that he must bring his case in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee Division. Petitioner's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #3 .) to update the court on detention conditions, (Dkt. #5 .) and any other pending motions, are moot. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/3/2018. Mailed notice. (ew, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to update the Court on detention conditions that inflict needless suffering to physical and mental injuries causing ongoing pain. (Envelope postmarked 11/16/2018.) (ew, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION for Release after trauma injuries causing chronic pain causing deformity. (Envelope Postmark date 11/3/18). (No case number on document). (gcy, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus and no copies filed by Nana Yaw Amo (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1 (Envelope postmark illegible), #2 Envelope 2 (Envelope not postmarked)) (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amo v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nana Yaw Amo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?