Bendik v. Cook County ILL et al

Plaintiff: Martin Bendik
Defendant: Superintendent Walsh, Cook County ILL, John Doe and Thomas Dart
Case Number: 1:2018cv07413
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Martin Bendik for attorney representation (jh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Martin Bendik for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (jh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 RECEIVED Amended Complaint by Martin Bendik. (Exhibits) (Envelope Not Postmarked) (jh, )
December 11, 2018 EMAILED a copy of the Order dated 12/11/2018, #6 to the Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at the Cook County Jail. (jh, )
December 11, 2018 MAILED an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of order dated 12/11/2018 to the Plaintiff. (jh, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiffs place of incarceration to deduct $13.16 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to electronically send a copy of this order to the Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at the Cook County Jail. Summonses, however, shall not issue. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. Failure to submit an amended complaint by January 15, 2019, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if his mailing address changes. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is deferred. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/11/2018. Mailed notice(jh, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Martin Bendik for attorney representation. (jh, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Martin Bendik for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (jh, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Martin Bendik. (Exhibits) (Envelope not Postmarked) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bendik v. Cook County ILL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Bendik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County ILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?