Doe v. Medela LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Mary Abraham, Medela LLC, Gotham Professional Services, Susan Gotham and Gotham Professional Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07438
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS Report by Susan Gotham, Gotham Professional Services, Inc. (Matthis, Jordan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Quinones, Melisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery by Jordan Lane Matthis on behalf of Susan Gotham, Gotham Professional Services, Inc. (Matthis, Jordan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Medela LLC. (Papka, Craig)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to continue Initial Status hearing #15 is granted. Initial Status hearing reset for 1/10/2018 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 12/19/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Melisa Quinones for presentment of motion to continue #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Continue)(Quinones, Melisa)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to continue Initial status hearing (Quinones, Melisa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Susan Gotham, Gotham Professional Services, Inc. (Matthis, Jordan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Melisa Quinones (Quinones, Melisa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 DEFENDANT MEDELA LLCS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medela LLC (Papka, Craig)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Medela LLC(Papka, Craig)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Daniel Simandl's Motion to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15176358. (Simandl, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Susan Gotham, Gotham Professional Services by Jordan Lane Matthis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matthis, Jordan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Susan Gotham, Gotham Professional Services by Patrick Frasor Moran (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moran, Patrick)
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Medela LLC by Craig T. Papka of von Briesen & Roper, s.c. (Papka, Craig)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Papka, Craig)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Kane County, case number (18 L 487) filed by Medela LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15164263. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(Papka, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Medela LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medela LLC
Represented By: Craig T. Papka
Represented By: Daniel Robert Simandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Professional Services
Represented By: Patrick Frasor Moran
Represented By: Jordan Lane Matthis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Gotham
Represented By: Patrick Frasor Moran
Represented By: Jordan Lane Matthis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Professional Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Frasor Moran
Represented By: Jordan Lane Matthis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Melisa Quinones
Represented By: Joseph Paul Giamanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?