Hayes v. National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC

Plaintiff: Michael Hayes
Defendant: National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07465
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Plaintiff has filed a notice of settlement #7 notifying the Court that Plaintiff has settled its claims against Defendant National Accounts Systems of Omaha, LLC. The status hearing set for 1/8/2019 #6 is stricken and reset for 1/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. If the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to the next status hearing, the status date will be stricken and the parties will not need to appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Celetha Chatman of Change of Address (Chatman, Celetha)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Michael Jacob Wood of Change of Address (Wood, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Settlement by Michael Hayes (Chatman, Celetha)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hayes as to National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Chatman, Celetha)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC (yt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Hayes by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Hayes by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Hayes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15168550. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Account Systems of Omaha, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hayes
Represented By: Michael Jacob Wood
Represented By: Celetha Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?