Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON v. Officer John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON and Beatrice Roberson
Defendant: Officer John Doe and The Village of Midlothian
Respondent: Illinois State Police
Case Number: 1:2018cv07476
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. Responses for motions #30 and #32 are due by 1/29/2019; replies by 2/5/2019; motion hearings for #30 and #32 set for 1/16/2019 are stricken. Motion hearing on motion to compel #34 remains set for 1/16/2019. Status hearing, motion hearing on #30 and #32 , and oral arguments are set for 2/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion to compel #34 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson to compel compliance with subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grp Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Grp Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Grp Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Grp Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Grp Ex 5)(Kulis, Gregory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for sanctions #32 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson for sanctions for Illinois State Police's failure to comply with deadlines agreed to and set by the Court (Kulis, Gregory)
January 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion to stay #30 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stephenson, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Respondent Illinois State Police to stay its response to Plaintiff's subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Stephenson, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Defendants' motion for extension of time #24 is granted. The deadline for the State Police to respond to Plaintiff's subpoena is extended to 1/4/2019. Plaintiff's motion to compel subpoena #26 is granted in part. Defendants shall comply with the subpoena by 1/4/2019. Any request for attorneys' fees must be brought by separate motion, thus this portion of the motion is denied. Status hearing remains set for 1/8/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's motion to compel #26 will be heard at 11:00 a.m. on 1/8/2019 (not 9:00 a.m.) along with the other outstanding motion and status hearing. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion to compel #26 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
December 26, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson to compel (Kulis, Gregory)
December 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/8/2019 at 11:00 AM. (Stephenson, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION by Respondent Illinois State Police for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stephenson, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #18 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separate document. Motion hearing date of 12/5/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for leave to file #18 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of motion #19 . (smm, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing scheduled for 11/28/2018 is stricken from the Court's call, as the motion was not noticed properly. Parties are advised to consult Judge Lefkow's web page and to present motions with three business days notice. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 ENTERED in Error. (Kulis, Gregory) Modified on 11/28/2018 (smm, ).
November 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kulis, Gregory)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held. Motion to preserve evidence #7 is granted for reasons stated on the record. Motion to release identity #13 is denied without prejudice. Illinois State Police shall respond to the subpoena by 12/18/2018. Status hearing is set for 1/8/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Illinois State Policein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice RobersonPlaintiff's Motion Directed To The Illinois Police To Release The Identity Of The Officer And To Release All Witnesses To The Shooting Of Jemel Roberson #13 (Stephenson, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Illinois State Police by Michael Charles Stephenson (Stephenson, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #13 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/20/2018 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Kulis, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice RobersonPlaintiff's Motion Directed To The Illinois Police To Release The Identity Of The Officer And To Release All Witnesses To The Shooting Of Jemel Roberson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kulis, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Village of Midlothian by Michael J. Victor (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Victor, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Village of Midlothian by Julie M Koerner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Koerner, Julie)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Village of Midlothian by Clifford Gary Kosoff (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kosoff, Clifford)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Due to the Court being unavailable on 11/16/2018, the motion hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 11/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Kulis, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Beatrice RobersonPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE (Kulis, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEYS' LIEN by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kulis, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Monica Ghosh (Ghosh, Monica)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Brian M Orozco (Orozco, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulis, Gregory)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15169821.(Kulis, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON v. Officer John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village of Midlothian
Represented By: Michael J. Victor
Represented By: Clifford Gary Kosoff
Represented By: Julie M Koerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Roberson, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of JEMEL ROBERSON
Represented By: Monica Ghosh
Represented By: Brian M Orozco
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Roberson
Represented By: Monica Ghosh
Represented By: Brian M Orozco
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Illinois State Police
Represented By: Michael Charles Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?