Thompson v. Harris & Harris, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Angela Thompson
Defendant: Harris & Harris, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07527
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Joint status report due by 1/22/2019. Status hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/21/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angela Thompson. Harris & Harris, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wasieleski, Kristen)
November 15, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. (kb, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
November 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angela Thompson by David Scott Klain (Klain, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angela Thompson by Kristen Carroll Wasieleski (Wasieleski, Kristen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wasieleski, Kristen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angela Thompson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15175109. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Collection Letter, #2 Exhibit B-Caller Identification)(Wasieleski, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Harris & Harris, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris & Harris, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Thompson
Represented By: David Scott Klain
Represented By: Kristen Carroll Wasieleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?