Atkins v. Lashbrook et al
Petitioner: William Atkins
Respondent: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Case Number: 1:2018cv07559
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Petitioner William Atkins for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Envelope postmarked illegible). (#1 Attachment). (yap, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, #4 is denied. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee by February 11, 2019. Failure to comply with this order may result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is instructed to update the docket to reflect that Respondent is Jacqueline Lashbrook, Warden, Menard Correctional Center. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/26/2018. Mailed notice (nsf, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from William Atkins dated December, 2018. (ek, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Petitioner William Atkins to stay and abeyance and to allow equitable tolling. (Exhibit) (ek, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by William Atkins against Jacqueline Lashbrook. (Exhibit) (ek, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Petitioner William Atkins for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ek, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by Petitioner William Atkins for Stay and Abeyance and to allow equitable tolling. (Exhibits) (ek, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by William Atkins against Jacqueline Lashbrook (ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Lashbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?