Stewart v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: James Stewart
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Codilis & Associates P.C., McCalla Raymer Pierce, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07584
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff James Stewart. (yap, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' unopposed motions for enlargement of time #10 , #14 are granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 2/4/19. The 1/8/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Additionally, the initial status conference previously set for 1/8/19 is stricken and reset for 2/13/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Codilis & Associates P.C. by Michael Ryan Kemock (Kemock, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Susan J. Miller Overbey for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Overbey, Susan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Overbey, Susan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association by Susan J. Miller Overbey (Overbey, Susan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 STATUS Report by James Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing). (mc, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Julie Lanyon DeJong for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (DeJong, Julie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Codilis & Associates P.C. for extension of time Defendant Codilis & Associates, P.C.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (DeJong, Julie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Codilis & Associates P.C. by Julie Lanyon DeJong (DeJong, Julie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Stewart as to JPMorgan Chase National Association on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. by James Stewart (smm, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Stewart as to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (smm, )
December 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (tg, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Courts inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 1/8/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 12/28/2018, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400. receipt #4624213805. (gcy, ) (gcy, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff James Stewart. (gcy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Stewart; Jury Demand. (Exhibits).(gcy, ) Text Modified on 11/16/2018 (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Susan J. Miller Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codilis & Associates P.C.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Kemock
Represented By: Julie Lanyon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Pierce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?