LaFond et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amy LaFond and Danton LaFond
Defendant: General Motors Company, General Motors LLC, Woody Buick-GMC, Inc. and Matthew Pleticha
Case Number: 1:2018cv07769
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants General Motors Company, General Motors LLC, Woody Buick-GMC, Inc. to clarify Motion for Clarification (Johnson, Erin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 12/3/2018 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (pk, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Motion hearing held on 12/3/2018. Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses General Motors LLC. Case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County. General Motors Companys motion to dismiss #4 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/3/2018. Mailed notice. (pk, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Pleticha by Margaret Christina Firnstein (Firnstein, Margaret)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant Woody Buick-GMC, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Woody Buick-GMC, Inc.(Johnson, Erin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Woody Buick-GMC, Inc. by Erin Simone Johnson (Johnson, Erin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant General Motors Company's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #4 is entered and continued to 12/3/2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Time change only). Mailed notice (mw, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Simone Johnson for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #4 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Johnson, Erin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by General Motors LLC(Johnson, Erin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant General Motors Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Erin)
November 21, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants General Motors Company, General Motors LLC by Erin Simone Johnson (Johnson, Erin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Johnson, Erin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Cook of Cook County, case number (2018 L 010527) filed by General Motors Company, General Motors LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15206967. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata Group C)(Johnson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFond et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Represented By: Erin Simone Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Erin Simone Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Buick-GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Simone Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Pleticha
Represented By: Margaret Christina Firnstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy LaFond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danton LaFond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?