Kowalski v. Layng

Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Appellee: Patrick Layng and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng and Gus A Paloian
Case Number: 1:2018cv07956
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 7 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 10/30/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
January 2, 2019 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal, #1 Appellant and Appellee Designation of Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Transmittal Letter, #14 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
December 13, 2018 5 Notice by Patrick S. Layng of Non-Participation (Gulden, Cameron)
December 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by John W Guzzardo (Guzzardo, John)
December 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Eric S. Rein (Rein, Eric)
December 4, 2018 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record (Attachments: #1 Rule 8010(3) Letter, #2 Attorney Appearance Form).(smm, )
December 4, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 3, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 9130 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docke Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Represented By: Jan R. Kowalski
Represented By: Ernesto Dos Reis Borges, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Represented By: John Guzzardo
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng
Represented By: Candice M. Manyak
Represented By: Cameron M Gulden
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Gus A Paloian
Represented By: Devvrat Vikram Sinha
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?