Carillo v. Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico et al

Plaintiff: Gisell Carillo
Defendant: Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico, Aerolitoral S.A. de C.V. d/b/a Aeromexico Connect, Aerolitoral S.A. de C.V. and Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08018
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Case having been reassigned to Judge Leinenweber, Rule 16 conference set for 1/10/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Telly Andrews of Change of Address (Firm name and email address only) (Andrews, Telly)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Richard Alan Walker of Change of Address (Firm name and email address only) (Walker, Richard)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/18.(las, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gisell Carillo by Richard Francis Burke, Jr (Burke, Richard)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 1/24/2019 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 1/10/2019 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Gisell Carillo (Casciato, Jack)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Fed. R. Civ. P. 44.1 Notice by Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.(Walker, Richard)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Walker, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gisell Carillo by Jack Joseph Casciato (Casciato, Jack)
December 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 by Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico (Walker, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico by Telly Andrews (Andrews, Telly)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico by Richard Alan Walker (Walker, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walker, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 L 012345) filed by Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15249718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Cook County Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Affidavit of Damages, Jury Demand, Summons)(Walker, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carillo v. Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., d/b/a Aeromexico
Represented By: Telly Andrews
Represented By: Richard Alan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerolitoral S.A. de C.V. d/b/a Aeromexico Connect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerolitoral S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Telly Andrews
Represented By: Richard Alan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisell Carillo
Represented By: Richard Francis Burke, Jr.
Represented By: Jack Joseph Casciato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?