SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund et al v. Major Heating & Cooling, Inc.

Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan, Administrative Mgr. Kevin J. Schell, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund and SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund
Defendant: Major Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08024
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund, SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, Kevin J. Schell, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund, SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan as to Major Heating & Cooling, Inc. on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
January 17, 2019 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' counsel anticipates that receipt of confirmation of the Secretary of State service of process in the next week. Upon receipt of the confirmation, Plaintiffs shall promptly upload the return of service to the docket. Status hearing set for 02/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m. If Defendant is in default, by 02/25/2019, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default, noticed for presentment to coincide with the next status hearing date and time. Plaintiffs' counsel clarified that Count 1 is also for the time period of 06/2018 onward.Emailed notice (slb, )
January 15, 2019 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing is reset from 8:30 a.m. to 9:30 a.m. on the same date, 01/17/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
January 14, 2019 7 STATUS Report (Plaintiffs' Initial Status) by SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan, SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, Kevin J. Schell, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund (Scanlon, Cecilia)
December 7, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 01/17/2019 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
December 7, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
December 7, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Major Heating & Cooling, Inc. (mc, )
December 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 6, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan, SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, Kevin J. Schell, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund by Catherine Marie Chapman (Chapman, Catherine)
December 6, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan, SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, Kevin J. Schell, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
December 6, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Scanlon, Cecilia)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund, SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee, SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund, Kevin J. Schell, SMART Local 265 Pension Fund, SMART Local 265, SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund, Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund, SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15250100.(Scanlon, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund et al v. Major Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Joint Apprentice Training Committee
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 265 Industry Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Labor Management Cooperative Committee Trust Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Supplemental Retirement Savings Plan
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrative Mgr. Kevin J. Schell
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Pension Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Local 265 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?