Abrams v. Miles/Barns et al

Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Defendant: R/O Illinanno, Miles (Male), Miles/Barns and R/O Leflore
Case Number: 1:2018cv08028
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 15 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 1/17/2019. (ek, )
January 15, 2019 MAILED a copy of an order dated 1/15/2019 to plaintiff Edward Abrams and to the Trust Fund Office at Pontiac. (ek, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's state-court applications/orders for waivers of fees [ #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 ] are denied. The Court interprets Plaintiff's trust fund statement as an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #11 and grants it. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $1.14 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. Plaintiff's January 7, 2019, letter, which the Court interprets as a motion for a temporary restraining order #13 , is denied as moot. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must, by February 26, 2019, show good cause in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to accurately disclose his litigation history. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 pending the submission of a response to the show cause order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/15/2019. Mailed notice. (ek, )
January 8, 2019 13 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 1/7/19. (ek, )
January 8, 2019 12 NOTICE of Correction regarding #10 (ek, )
January 7, 2019 11 PRISONER Trust Fund Account Statement with letter dated 1/2/2019 by Edward Abrams. (ek, )
December 31, 2018 10 PROPOSED ORDER for waiver of court fees by Plaintiff (ek, ) Modified on 1/8/2019 (ek, ).
December 31, 2018 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for waiver of court fees. (ek, )
December 27, 2018 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, )
December 27, 2018 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, )
December 27, 2018 6 LETTER from Edward Abrams dated 12/21/1. (tt, )
December 7, 2018 MAILED a copy of an order dated 12/7/2018 and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to Plaintiff Edward Abrams. (ek, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER : Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding his filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 11, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice.(ek, )
December 5, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for attorney representation (ek, )
December 5, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edward Abrams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
December 5, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
December 5, 2018 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Edward Abrams (Exhibit)(ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Miles/Barns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/O Illinanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles (Male)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles/Barns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/O Leflore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?