Ocol v. Chicago Teachers Union et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Ocol
Defendant: Andrea R. Waintroob, American Federation of Teachers, Lynne O. Sered, Lara Shayne, Lisa Madigan, Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr., Chicago Teachers Union and Judy Biggert
Case Number: 1:2018cv08038
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Ioppolo for presentment of extension of time #22 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Ioppolo, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Judy Biggert, Lisa Madigan, Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr, Lynne O. Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea R. Waintroob for extension of time (Unopposed) (Ioppolo, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joseph Ocol. Lisa Madigan waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Pro hac vice motions are granted [ #13 , #14 ]. Union defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint to 3/11/19 is granted #17 . Status hearing set 2/12/19 is re-set 3/13/19 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/28/2019. Mailed notice. (ek, )
January 27, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Ocol by Jonathan Franklin Mitchell (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by George A. Luscombe, III for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Luscombe, George)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Chicago Teachers Union for extension of time Union Defendants' Consent Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (Luscombe, George)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chicago Teachers Union Notice As To Affiliates (Luscombe, George)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Federation of Teachers Notice As To Affiliates (Luscombe, George)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15415110. (Shiffrin, Joshua)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15415082. (West, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lisa Madigan by Sarah Hughes Newman Kwame Raoul, Illinois Attorney General, successor in office to Lisa Madigan (Newman, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Judy Biggert, Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr, Lynne O. Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea R. Waintroob by Sarah Hughes Newman (Newman, Sarah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lisa Madigan by Thomas A. Ioppolo Attorney General Kwame Raoul, successor in office (Ioppolo, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Judy Biggert, Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr, Lynne O. Sered, Lara Shayne, Andrea R. Waintroob by Thomas A. Ioppolo (Ioppolo, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Chicago Teachers Union by Robert E. Bloch (Bloch, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Chicago Teachers Union by George A. Luscombe, III (Luscombe, George)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joseph Ocol. Chicago Teachers Union waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joseph Ocol. American Federation of Teachers waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 2/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
January 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joseph Ocol. Judy Biggert waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Lynne O. Sered waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Lara Shayne waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019; Andrea R. Waintroob waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Ocol by Norman Rifkind (Rifkind, Norman)
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Ocol; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15252666. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rifkind, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocol v. Chicago Teachers Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea R. Waintroob
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Robert E. Bloch
Represented By: John M West
Represented By: George A. Luscombe, III
Represented By: Joshua Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne O. Sered
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Shayne
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert F. OBrien, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Teachers Union
Represented By: Robert E. Bloch
Represented By: John M West
Represented By: George A. Luscombe, III
Represented By: Joshua Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Biggert
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ocol
Represented By: Norman Rifkind
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?