International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO et al v. Needham Excavating, Inc., an Iowa corporation

Plaintiff: Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund and Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund
Defendant: Needham Excavating, Inc., an Iowa corporation and Needham Excavating Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08045
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the pending motion before the MDL Panel, the motion #13 to stay is granted and the extension motion #11 to answer is extended even further if the case remains here. The answer deadline is reset to 03/18/2019. All other deadlines are suspended. The status hearing of 01/18/2019 is reset to 03/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with another status report (if the case is still here) due by 03/14/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
January 14, 2019 15 STATUS Report [JOINT INITIAL] by Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund (LaRose, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2019 14 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Ann LaRose for presentment of motion to stay, #13 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/18/2019 at 08:30 AM. (LaRose, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2019 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund to stay Proceedings [JOINT] (LaRose, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2019 12 MOTION for transfer and consolidation of actions to the Southern District of Iowa, Eastern Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1407 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for transfer of actions to the Southern District of Iowa, Eastern Division and for consolidation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, #2 Schedule of actions) (tt, )
January 2, 2019 11 MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Plead, filed by Defendant Needham Excavating Inc.. (Niew, Stanley)
January 2, 2019 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund, Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan as to All Defendants. (LaRose, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2018 9 NOTICE by Needham Excavating Inc. NOTICE OF FILING (Attachments: #1 MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION OF ACTIONS)(Niew, Stanley)
December 21, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Needham Excavating Inc. by Stanley E. Niew (Niew, Stanley)
December 7, 2018 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
December 7, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 01/18/2019 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
December 7, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Needham Excavating, Inc., an Iowa corporation (mc, )
December 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
December 7, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert)
December 7, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale)
December 7, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund by Elizabeth Ann LaRose (LaRose, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (LaRose, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund, Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund, Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15253447. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(LaRose, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO et al v. Needham Excavating, Inc., an Iowa corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Operating Engineers Retirement Enhancement Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D. Pierson
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 150 IUOE Vacation Savings Plan
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 150 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Operating Engineers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Research and Service Trust Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Needham Excavating, Inc., an Iowa corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Needham Excavating Inc.
Represented By: Stanley E. Niew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?