Bailey v. Cook County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Rudolph Bailey
Defendant: Tom Dart and Cook County Jail
Case Number: 1:2018cv08067
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 MAILED Plaintiff one blank USM- 285 service form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. (yap, )
January 25, 2019 8 EMAILED SUMMONS issued, certified copy of order 1/25/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to defendant Sheriff Tom Dart via email. (yap, ).
January 25, 2019 EMAILED a copy of this order dated 1/25/2019 #6 to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail. (yap, )
January 25, 2019 7 COMPLAINT filed by Rudolph Bailey. (yap, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $15.84 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (3) correct the docket to reflect that Cook County Jail is no longer an active Defendant; (4) issue summons for service on Sheriff Dart; and (5) send Plaintiff one blank USM- 285 service form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must return the completed USM-285 service form for Sheriff Dart to the Clerk in care of the Prisoner Correspondent by March 1, 2019. If he fails do so, the Court may dismiss Sheriff Dart, as well as dismiss this case for lack of prosecution. The Marshal is appointed to effect service and is authorized to send a request for waiver of service in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d) before attempting personal service. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of address notice if he is transferred to another facility or released. If he fails to comply, this action may be dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/25/2019. Mailed notice (yap, )
December 20, 2018 5 MAIL RETURNED, Acknowledgment Letter sent to Rudolph Bailey returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to #2017-1009157, Cook County Jail - CCJ, P.O. Box 089002, Chicago, IL 60608. (kb, )
December 7, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Rudolph Bailey for attorney representation. (yap, )
December 7, 2018 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Rudolph Bailey for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachment). (yap, )
December 7, 2018 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (yap, )
December 7, 2018 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Rudolph Bailey (Envelope postmarked 12/3/2018). (yap, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Cook County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?