Powell v. Owens et al

Petitioner: Willie G Powell
Respondent: Angela M Owens
Case Number: 1:2018cv08125
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED, for document #3 , #4 sent to Willie G. Powell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to #03818-068, Sandstone - FCI, P.O. Box 1000, Sandstone, MN 55072. (kb, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/15/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The habeas corpus petition is denied as an unauthorized second and successive 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion. Any pending motions are moot. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/15/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Willie G Powell against Angela M Owens (Attachments: #1 (Envelope postmarked 12/7/2018)) (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie G Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela M Owens
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?