American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania et al v. Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania and Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: Certain interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Certificate Number 2017 100003409/DRA001077-01 and Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 1:2018cv08268
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Randi L. Ellias of Change of Address (NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Ellias, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London by David E. Walker (Walker, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Unopposed motion to continue Petition to Appoint Arbitrator #10 is granted. Hearing on Petition to Appoint Arbitrator is reset for 2/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 1/4/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Julie Rodriguez Aldort for presentment of motion to continue #10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Aldort, Julie)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company to continue Petition to Appoint Arbitrator (Aldort, Julie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company regarding Petition to Appoint Arbitrator served on Illinois Department of Insurance on December 19, 2018 (Ellias, Randi)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company regarding Petition to Appoint Arbitrator served on Mendes & Mount on December 20, 2018 (Ellias, Randi)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding #5 . (kp, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator NOTICE of Motion by Julie Rodriguez Aldort for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Aldort, Julie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. (kp, ) Modified on 12/19/2018 (kp, ).
December 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company by Julie Rodriguez Aldort (Aldort, Julie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company by Randi L. Ellias (Ellias, Randi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company (Ellias, Randi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Appoint Arbitrator filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15286627. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellias, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania et al v. Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Randi L. Ellias
Represented By: Julie Rodriguez Aldort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Randi L. Ellias
Represented By: Julie Rodriguez Aldort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Certificate Number 2017 100003409/DRA001077-01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: David E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?