Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. W.W. Grainger, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Defendant: W.W. Grainger, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08336
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. W.W. Grainger, Inc. waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant W.W. Grainger, Inc. (dal, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Christenson, Teirney)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company by Teirney S Christenson (Christenson, Teirney)
December 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Christenson, Teirney)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15299336.(Christenson, Teirney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. W.W. Grainger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. Grainger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?