Heiting et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Ardyce Heiting and Kenneth Heiting
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv08520
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #14 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ardyce Heiting, Kenneth Heiting (Ritzu, Hallie)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Heiting, Ardyce Heiting as to United States of America served on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Civil Process Clerk, US Attorney, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt - Attorney General)(Ritzu, Hallie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Valerie Rebecca Raedy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Raedy, Valerie)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 2/26/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ardyce Heiting, Kenneth Heiting by David A. Baker (Baker, David)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018. Mailed notice (rp, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
December 28, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United States of America (pj, )
December 28, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ardyce Heiting, Kenneth Heiting by Hallie Jane Ritzu (Ritzu, Hallie)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ardyce Heiting, Kenneth Heiting by Andrew R. Roberson (Roberson, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ardyce Heiting, Kenneth Heiting by Jared R. Cloud (Cloud, Jared)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cloud, Jared)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REFUND filed by Kenneth Heiting, Ardyce Heiting; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15320004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Heiting Trust Agreement)(Cloud, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiting et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardyce Heiting
Represented By: Andrew R. Roberson
Represented By: Jared R. Cloud
Represented By: Hallie Jane Ritzu
Represented By: David A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Heiting
Represented By: Andrew R. Roberson
Represented By: Jared R. Cloud
Represented By: Hallie Jane Ritzu
Represented By: David A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Valerie Rebecca Raedy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?