Liceaga v. JetSmarter

Plaintiff: Edward Liceaga, Anthony Brummel and Delphine Pontvieux
Defendant: JetSmarter, Inc., JetSmarter and Sergey Petrossov
Case Number: 1:2019cv00107
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by JetSmarter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Feinberg, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Edward Feinberg for presentment of motion to dismiss #18 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Feinberg, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant JetSmarter to dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Feinberg, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint #16 (Chatt, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED complaint by Anthony Brummel, Edward Liceaga against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Chatt, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Correction regarding #13 (tt, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Edward Liceaga re amended document #13 (Chatt, William)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Chatt, William) Modified on 2/15/2019 (tt, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file his First Amended Complaint #10 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by William Otto Chatt for presentment of motion to amend/correct #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/7/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Chatt, William)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Liceaga to amend/correct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Pleading)(Chatt, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's agreed motion to extend the time for defendant to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 1/28/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Motion to Extend the Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Edward Feinberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Feinberg, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant JetSmarter, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Feinberg, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by JetSmarter, Inc. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinberg, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JetSmarter, Inc. (Feinberg, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JetSmarter, Inc. by Daniel Edward Feinberg (Feinberg, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Feinberg, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018L13127) filed by JetSmarter, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15337701. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Feinberg, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liceaga v. JetSmarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Liceaga
Represented By: William Otto Chatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brummel
Represented By: William Otto Chatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphine Pontvieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetSmarter, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetSmarter
Represented By: Daniel Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Petrossov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?