White v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric White
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00114
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric White by Thomas Gregory Jarrard (Jarrard, Thomas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eric White. United Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eric White. United Continental Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to motion to appear pro hac vice #5 (Crotty, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Declaring This Action Exempt from Filing Fees Under 38 U.S.C. 4323(h)(1). Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/10/2019. Mailed notice (lf, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Romer-Friedman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/18/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric White to be Declared Exempt from Filing Fees Under 38 U.S.C. 4323(h)(1) (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15349179. (Crotty, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants United Airlines, Inc., United Continental Holdings, Inc. (jjr, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric White by Robert Joseph Barton (Barton, Robert)
January 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric White by Peter Romer-Friedman (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric White; Jury Demand. (Romer-Friedman, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric White
Represented By: Robert Joseph Barton
Represented By: Peter Romer-Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Jarrard
Represented By: Matthew Zachary Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?