Teverbaugh et al v. Lima One Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taverbaugh Design Company and Ava Teverbaugh
Defendant: Lima One Capital, LLC, Unknown Owners, Fannie Mae and Federal National Mortgage Association Organized and existing under the laws of the United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/4/2019. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On 1/10/2019, the court dismissed this action without prejudice, allowing Plaintiff 14 days to reinstate. No motion for reinstatement having been filed within the time set by the court's order, the dismissal is with prejudice. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by All Plaintiffs for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/24/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Teverbaugh, Ava)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motions to dismiss [10, 11] are stricken without prejudice as moot. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Ava Teverbaugh to Dismiss Parties Agree to Arbitration (lf, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Ava Teverbaugh to Dismiss Parties Agree to Arbitration (lf, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court has dismissed Ms. Teverbaugh's complaint for lack of jurisdiction. Her motion for emergency injunctive relief #7 and for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #8 are therefore stricken as moot. The court notes, however, that Ms. Teverbaugh's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is incomplete: Ms. Teverbaugh claims in her sworn affidavit to have no resources or income of any kind--no salary or wages, no government benefits, no family support, no savings, and no real property. Yet her complaint alleges that she is the owner of property in Glenwood, Illinois. If she in fact has no finances of any kind, the court requires some explanation as to how she is supporting her two dependent children and paying rent or a mortgage for her home. As she allegedly owns real property, the court will expect her to explain her failure to disclose this in answer to question 7 of the form affidavit. Should Ms. Teverbaugh file an amended complaint in this case, or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis in other federal lawsuits, she is reminded of the need to be fully forthcoming about her finances. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/16/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
January 11, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE: On January 9, 2019 a check was presented for the $400 filing fee in this case. On January 10, 2019 the Clerk was notified that the payment has not been accepted by the financial institution. Payment of the $400 filing fee is still owed as well as $53 Non-Sufficient Funds (NSF) fee. (td, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION and Financial affidavit by Plaintiff Ava Teverbaugh (ek, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR Temporary Injunctive relief and memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof by Plaintiff Ava Teverbaugh. (ek, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : Plaintiff's Petition for Declaratory Relief #1 is dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction. Ms. Teverbaugh has leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days, but only if she can state claim within this court's jurisdiction. Her emergency motion for temporary injunctive relief (id. at page 15) is denied without prejudice to presentation in state court. (For further detail see Order.) Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/10/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Fannie Mae, Lima One Capital, LLC. (jh, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ava Teverbaugh. (jh, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ava Teverbaugh. (Exhibits) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teverbaugh et al v. Lima One Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lima One Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association Organized and existing under the laws of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taverbaugh Design Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava Teverbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?