Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC v. Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC

Plaintiff: Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00208
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Closing order dated: 03/06/2019)(ek, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: A NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice having been filed, this case is hereby closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(maf)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC with Prejudice (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 3/13/19 is re-set to 3/27/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (maf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #8 is granted. Defendant shall file its answer on or before 3/6/19. Status hearing set for 3/13/19 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Kimberly Michelle Hare for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hare, Kimberly)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Hare, Kimberly)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC as to Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (ek, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC by Timothy E. Grochocinski (Grochocinski, Timothy)
January 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (jjr, )
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC by Joseph Paul Oldaker (Oldaker, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC (Grochocinski, Timothy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grochocinski, Timothy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15361501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Grochocinski, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC v. Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proximity Sensors of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Joseph Paul Oldaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?