Mobilia v. Receivables Management Partners, LLC

Plaintiff: Christine Mobilia
Defendant: Receivables Management Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00209
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Stein, Brandon)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Second - Unopposed (Stein, Brandon)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Christine Mobilia (Thompson, Bryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to file response/reply #9 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/8/2019. The motion presentment date of 2/20/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #9 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Stein, Brandon)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC for extension of time to file response/reply Unopposed Motion for enlargement of time to file responsive pleading (Stein, Brandon)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Mobilia as to Receivables Management Partners, LLC on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Thompson, Bryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 3/13/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Mobilia by Robert W. Harrer (Harrer, Robert)
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Mobilia by Bryan Paul Thompson (Thompson, Bryan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Mobilia; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15361506. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobilia v. Receivables Management Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mobilia
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: Robert W. Harrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Management Partners, LLC
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Brandon S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?