Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. AG Construction Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity
Defendant: AG Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00210
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by G Ryan Liska for presentment of motion for entry of default, #13 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Liska, G)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Liska, G)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the initial status conference previously set for 2/21/19 is stricken and reset for 3/12/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re status report, #10 (Liska, G)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report (Initial) by Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus (Liska, G)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity as to AG Construction Services, Inc. on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Liska, G)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 2/21/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 2/11/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AG Construction Services, Inc. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Amy Nicole Carollo (Carollo, Amy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Katherine C.V. Mosenson (Mosenson, Katherine)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Patrick T. Wallace (Wallace, Patrick)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by G Ryan Liska (Liska, G)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Liska, G)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15361560.(Liska, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. AG Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wenskus
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Welfare Fund Of The Health and Welfare Department Of the Construction And General Laborers' District Council Of Chicago And Vicinity
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?