Tucker v. USAA Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Richard Tucker
Defendant: Alltran Financial, LP and USAA Savings Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00213
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference held on 3/5/2019. Rule 26(f)() disclosures to be made by 3/19/2019. All discovery to be commenced in time to be completed by 10/25/2019. Reports from retained expert under Rule 26(a)(2) due from Plaintiff by 8/23/2019; from defendants by 9/6/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff to prepare proposed pretrial order draft y 2/14/2020; Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2020. Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings #18 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed by or on 3/26/2019; reply to be filed by or on 4/9/2019; ruling set for 4/24/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #22 is granted. Defendant Alltran Financial, LP's motion to attend pretrial conference telephonically #23 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Richard Tucker (Chami, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Danielle Nicole Twait for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #23 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/5/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Twait, Danielle)
February 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Alltran Financial, LP to Appear Telephonically at Pretrial Conference (Twait, Danielle)
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15537182. (Fanaselle, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED Answer by USAA Savings Bank to complaint #1 , COUNTERCLAIM filed by USAA Savings Bank against Richard Tucker . (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca L Dircks for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings #18 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/5/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by USAA Savings Bank in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings #18 (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant USAA Savings Bank for judgment on the pleadings Partial (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alltran Financial, LP (Twait, Danielle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alltran Financial, LP(Twait, Danielle)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically at the Pretrial Conference #14 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST to appear Telephonically at the Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chami, David) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/15/2019 (jh, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Unopposed motion for an extension of time to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #8 is granted to and including 2/20/2019, without an appearance. Initial status hearing set for 3/18/2019 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 3/5/2019 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by USAA Savings Bank (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Savings Bank(Dircks, Rebecca)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant USAA Savings Bank by Rebecca L Dircks (Dircks, Rebecca)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Danielle Nicole Twait for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Twait, Danielle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Alltran Financial, LP for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (unopposed) (Twait, Danielle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alltran Financial, LP by Danielle Nicole Twait (Twait, Danielle)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Tucker as to USAA Savings Bank on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Chami, David)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Tucker as to Alltran Financial, LP on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Chami, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Alltran Financial, LP, and USAA Savings Bank. (acm)
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Tucker by David Ali Chami (Chami, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chami, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Tucker; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15362077.(Chami, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. USAA Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltran Financial, LP
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Twait
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: Rebecca L Dircks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tucker
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?