In Re Marshaun Boykin
In Re: Marshaun Boykin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00217
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Executive Committee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of U.S. Post Office Receipt, article no. 7014 2120 0004 3065 4063. (tt, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 RETURN of U.S. Post Office Receipt, article no. 7014 2120 0004 3065 4070. (tt, )
February 12, 2019 RETURN of Documents submitted by Marshaun Boykin on 01/24/2019 in regards to a new case filing. Pursuant to Executive Committee Order #1 dated 01/15/2019, documents to be mailed back to Mr. Boykin at #R-50417, Dixon-DIX, 2600 North Brinton Ave., Dixon, IL 61021. Sent via certified mail receipt article number 7014 2120 0004 3065 4063 and 7014 2120 0004 3065 4070. (jjr, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of U.S. Post Office Receipt, article no. number 7014 2120 0004 3065 3509. (jjr, )
January 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (mc, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER : Pro se litigant Marshaun Boykin has filed at least 41 cases in this Court and has unpaid filing fees of 18,906.71.It is the judgment of the Executive Committee that reasonable and necessary restraints must be imposed upon Mr. Boykin's ability to file new civil cases in this District pro se or otherwise until he pays $18,906.71 in unpaid fees to the Court. Cases in existence prior to the entry of this order are not affected by this order and shall proceed as usual. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE in its capacity as the supervisor of the assignment of cases, that the clerk is directed to return unfiled any documents or presentments submitted either directly or indirectly by or on behalf of Marshaun Boykin. A copy of this order shall be included with the returned documents, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any password issued to Marshaun Boykin for access to the electronic filing system shall be disabled, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after making payment of $18,906.71 in unpaid fees, Marshaun Boykin may submit to the Executive Committee a motion to modify or rescind this order, unless he demonstrates to the Executive Committee in writing that he is in imminent danger of great bodily harm, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that nothing in this order shall be construed ----- a)to affect Mr. Boykin's ability to defend himself in any criminal action, b)to deny Mr. Boykin access to the federal courts through the filing of a petition for a writ of habeas corpus or other extraordinary writ, or c)to deny Mr. Boykin access to the United States Court of Appeals or the United States Supreme Court, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED That any new complaints filed by Mr. Boykin and transferred to this Court from another jurisdiction shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall cause to be created and maintained a miscellaneous file with the title "In the matter of Marshaun Boykin" and case number 19 C 0217. The miscellaneous file shall serve as the repository of this order and any order or minute order entered pursuant to this order. The Clerk will also maintain a miscellaneous docket associated with the file. All orders retained in the file will be entered on that docket following standard docketing procedures. A brief entry will be made on the docket indicating the receipt of any materials from Mr. Boykin, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall cause a copy of this order to be mailed to Mr. Boykin at #R-50417, Dixon-DIX, 2600 North Brinton Ave., Dixon, IL 61021, the address given by Mr. Boykin in documents received on November 27, 2018. Such mailing shall be by certified or registered mail, return receipt requested. Signed by the Executive Committee on 1/15/2019: Mailed notice certified mail return receipt 7014 2120 0004 3065 3509 (mc, ) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Marshaun Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Marshaun Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?