Mokkapat v. Greenscape Homes, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Prabhas Mokkapat
Defendant: Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC, Kathleen Washko, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Keith R Neumann, KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Jennifer Brost, Lusk Law LLC, Elizabeth Kozar, Kenneth P. Neumann, Greenscape Realty LLC, Michael P Lusk and Greenscape Ventures, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00228
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 3/6/2019. Any renewed motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before 3/26/2019; response shall be filed on or before 5/10/2019; reply shall be filed on or before 5/24/2019. Motion hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Parties are reminded that there is no stay of discovery. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC by Ulyana Bekker (Bekker, Ulyana)
February 26, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED complaint by Prabhas Mokkapat against All Defendants (Caghan, Paul)
February 12, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of election #29 , Defendant's motions to dismiss #21 , #23 and #26 are denied as moot. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before 2/26/2019. Motion hearing previously set for 2/12/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 30 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC (Tambourine, Sheri)
February 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Prabhas Mokkapat Plaintiff's Notice of Election to File Amended Complaint by February 26, 2019 Pursuant to Rule 15(A)(1) (Caghan, Paul)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motions to dismiss #21 , #23 and #26 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Courts standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether he/she will amend the complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Defendant's motions to dismiss #21 , #23 and #26 are set for presentment on 2/12/2019. Initial status hearing previously set for 2/21/2019, is stricken. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make an election regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Sheri Angelina Tambourine for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #26 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Tambourine, Sheri)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC (Tambourine, Sheri)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Angelo Dominic DiBartolomeo for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #23 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Michael P Lusk, Lusk Law LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #23 (DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Michael P Lusk, Lusk Law LLC (DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(O'Brien, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(O'Brien, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MKJ Holdings LLC by Sheri Angelina Tambourine (Tambourine, Sheri)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MKJ Holdings LLC by Kevin Michael O'Hagan (O'Hagan, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Defendants' motions for extension of time #12 , #14 , #16 are granted, and Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings by 2/5/19. The 1/29/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 2/21/19 initial status conference date and 2/11/19 initial status report deadline stand. Mailed notice (clw, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. O'Brien for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (O'Brien, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC for extension of time (O'Brien, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Angelo Dominic DiBartolomeo for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Michael P Lusk, Lusk Law LLC for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Michael P. Lusk and Lusk Law LLC's Motion for Extension of Time)(DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Sheri Angelina Tambourine for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Tambourine, Sheri)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC for extension of time to file response/reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Tambourine, Sheri)
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC by Sheri Angelina Tambourine (Tambourine, Sheri)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC by Kevin Michael O'Hagan (O'Hagan, Kevin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 2/21/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 2/11/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael P Lusk, Lusk Law LLC by Angelo Dominic DiBartolomeo (DiBartolomeo, Angelo)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael P Lusk, Lusk Law LLC by Anthony G Barone (Barone, Anthony)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC by Leslie Gregory Bleifuss (Bleifuss, Leslie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC by Michael A. O'Brien (O'Brien, Michael)
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Brien, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (18 L 9016) filed by Jennifer Brost, Greenscape Homes, LLC, Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC, Greenscape Realty LLC, Greenscape Ventures, LLC, KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC, MKJ Holdings LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15363910. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F 1 of 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F 2 of 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F 3 of 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F 4 of 4)(O'Brien, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mokkapat v. Greenscape Homes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenscape Homes, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenscape Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKJ Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Washko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenscape Homes-KPN LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith R Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPN Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Brost
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lusk Law LLC
Represented By: Angelo Dominic DiBartolomeo
Represented By: Anthony G Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kozar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenscape Realty LLC
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Tambourine
Represented By: Ulyana Bekker
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Lusk
Represented By: Angelo Dominic DiBartolomeo
Represented By: Anthony G Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenscape Ventures, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prabhas Mokkapat
Represented By: Paul A. Caghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?